GA HB302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 8 and Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to buildings and housing and local government, respectively, so as to prohibit local governments from adopting or enforcing ordinances or regulations relating to or regulating building design elements as applied to one or two-family dwellings; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to revise the term "zoning" as it relates to zoning procedures; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local government; adopting or enforcing ordinances or regulations relating to or regulating building design elements as applied to one or two-family dwellings; prohibit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-04HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-14HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback