GA HB302 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to change certain requirements relating to advertising and notice requirements pertaining to millage rate adoption; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; property; change certain requirements to notice pertaining to millage rate adoption
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] |
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-02-14 | House | House Postponed |
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hopper |