GA HB301 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from income taxes, so as to delete an income tax deduction for certain physicians serving as community based faculty physicians; to create a new income tax credit for taxpayers who are licensed physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, or physician assistants who provide uncompensated preceptorship training to medical students, advanced practice registered nurse students, or physician assistant students for certain periods of time; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; certain physicians; delete deduction to create new credit; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #698 (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #118 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #118 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Hopper |