GA HB299 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Effective Date 2024-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-9-2.1, Title 16, Title 19, Title 20, and Chapter 2 of Title 38, Chapter 2 of Title 40, of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to appointment, compensation, authority, qualifications, training, and other limitations of associate probate court judges, crimes and offenses, domestic relations, education, military affairs, and registration and licensing of motor vehicles, respectively, so as to add appropriate references to the United States Space Force; to make conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Code; add appropriate references to United States Space Force; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Thomas [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Rep. Bethany Ballard [R] |
Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #641 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #62 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #62 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Effective Date 2024-07-01 | |
2024-04-22 | Act 389 | |
2024-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House Hopper |