GA HB295 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Douglas, approved March 10, 1993 (Ga. L. 1993, p. 4022), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 3776), so as to revise the provisions for the filling of vacancies in the office of mayor; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Douglas, City of; office of mayor; revise provisions for filling vacancies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #67 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #45 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #45 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Effective Date | |
2017-03-29 | Act 13 | |
2017-03-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hopper |