GA HB290 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation of hospitals and related institutions, so as to prohibit hospitals and nursing homes from instituting any policy during a declared public health emergency that limits patients' abilities to be visited by designated family members or friends as a condition precedent to obtaining or maintaining a permit to operate a hospital or nursing home; to provide for reasonable safety precautions; to provide for limited liability; to provide for related matters; to provide for a short title; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals and nursing homes; policy during a declared public health emergency that limits patients' abilities to be visited by designated family members and friends; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Motion To Table: Senate Vote #416 (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub As Am: House Vote #357 (Y: 100 N: 70 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Setzler Am 33 1976: House Vote #356 (Y: 97 N: 73 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #320 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #208 (Y: 113 N: 57 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-31HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2021-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-29SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-04HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-03HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59302
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196702
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199314
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199985
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201431
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202060
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202364
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202230
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202307
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202300
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59302#18442
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59302#18730
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59302#18795
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59302#18809
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59302#18918

Bill Comments

feedback