GA HB286 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to county police, so as to restrict the ability of county governing authorities to reduce funding for county police departments; to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to municipal corporations, so as to restrict the ability of municipal or consolidated government governing authorities to reduce funding for municipal police departments; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; restrict ability of county governing authorities to reduce funding for county police departments
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #372 (Y: 100 N: 73 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #270 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #93 (Y: 101 N: 69 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #270 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #93 (Y: 101 N: 69 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-07 | Act 263 | |
2021-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House Postponed |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House Hopper |