GA HB284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a merger of the independent school system of the City of Cordele and the school districts in the County of Crisp lying outside the corporate limits of said City, approved February 11, 1957 (Ga. L. 1957, p. 2066), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 29, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4125), so as to change the compensation of members of the Crisp County Board of Education; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crisp County; Board of Education; change compensation of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #73 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #45 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Vote #45 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 29 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 82 | |
2017-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House Hopper |