GA HB283 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to update and revise terminology; to delete obsolete, unused, and unnecessary provisions; to revise funding weights; to revise provisions for earning funding for certain personnel; to revise provisions relating to submission of available positions; to provide for a grant program for technology capital; to revise provisions relating to home study programs; to clarify and revise certain provisions regarding charter schools, charter petitions, and charter funding; to authorize the Office of Student Achievement to establish a nonprofit corporation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; update and revise terminology; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #337 (Y: 21 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #338 (Y: 24 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #348 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #365 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #444 (Y: 168 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - House - House Vote #398 (Y: 119 N: 48 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #263 (Y: 20 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #264 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Vote #121 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07 Effective Date
2013-05-07 Act 335
2013-05-07HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2013-04-09HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2013-03-28HouseHouse Recedes from Position
2013-03-28SenateSenate Insists
2013-03-28HouseHouse Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub
2013-03-28SenateSenate Agrees House Amend or Sub As Amended
2013-03-26HouseHouse Agrees Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2013-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-03-25SenateSenate Third Read
2013-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2013-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-03-01SenateSenate Read and Referred
2013-02-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2013-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2013-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2013-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-02-11HouseHouse First Readers
2013-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20132014/HB/283
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/130258.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/131400.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/132818.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/135349.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/135630.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/135650.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/135709.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/136365.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/136397.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/136615.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/136617.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20132014/137066.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=9670
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11066
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11065
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11161
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11213
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11196
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11186
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=11185

Bill Comments

feedback