GA HB280 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying and possession of firearms, so as to authorize the carrying and possession of handguns in certain manners by weapons carry license holders in certain buildings or on real property owned by or leased to public institutions of postsecondary education; to provide for exceptions; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; license holders; carrying and possession of certain weapons in certain buildings or real property owned or leased to public institutions of postsecondary education; authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #385 (Y: 33 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #427 (Y: 96 N: 70 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #252 (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #262 (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #183 (Y: 108 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-04 Act 167
2017-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 31st, 13th, 47th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 23rd, 11th, 32nd
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Insisted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/280
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164607.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166970.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167462.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/168784.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170565.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170679.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15011
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15322
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15520
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15428

Bill Comments

feedback