GA HB280 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-1-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Sexual Offender Registry, so as to require registration when an individual is convicted of trafficking a person for sexual servitude; to provide for venue; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Sexual Offender Registry; individual convicted of trafficking a person for sexual servitude; require registration
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Hopper |