GA HB28 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-11-127 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to carrying weapons in unauthorized locations and penalty, so as to repeal a prohibition against carrying a weapon in a place of worship; to provide a short title; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Restoring Private Property Rights for Places of Worship Act of 2013; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Gregory [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Jason Spencer [R] | Rep. Delvis Dutton [R] |
Rep. Paulette Rakestraw [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-28 | House | House Hopper |
2012-12-19 | House | House Prefiled |