GA HB276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state sales and use tax, so as to modify the definition of dealer; to require the collection and remittance of sales tax by certain persons that facilitate certain retail sales; to define marketplace facilitators and marketplace sellers; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; certain persons that facilitate certain retail sales; require collection of tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #438 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House Vote #438 (Y: 111 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #319 (Y: 52 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #121 (Y: 158 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01 Effective Date
2020-01-30 Act 322
2020-01-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-01-29HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-01-16HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2020-01-16SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2020-01-15SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 52nd, 30th, 41st
2020-01-14HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 106th, 45th, 115th
2020-01-14HouseHouse Insisted
2020-01-13SenateSenate Transmitted House
2020-01-13SenateSenate Insisted
2019-04-02HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-29SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-29SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-29SenateSenate Engrossed
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-04HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-04HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/276
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/181209.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183498.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183602.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/185656.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/186591.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/188082.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/188085.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16670
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17132
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17127
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17332
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17335

Bill Comments

feedback