GA HB274 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from Catoosa County school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in the amount of $40,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that school district who are 65 years of age or older and whose income does not exceed $30,000.00; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Catoosa County; school district ad valorem tax; residents 65 years of age or older; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #74 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-30 | Act 106 | |
2019-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-12 | House | House Hopper |