GA HB274 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to solid waste management, so as to change certain provisions relating to declaration of policy and legislative intent relative to solid waste management; to define and redefine certain terms; to change certain provisions relating to permits for solid waste or special solid waste handling, disposal, or thermal treatment technology facilities and inspection of solid waste generators; to change certain provisions relating to number of solid waste facilities within a given area; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Solid waste management; permits; number of facilities within an area; change provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Rep. Delvis Dutton [R] | Rep. Billy Maddox [R] | Rep. Howard Mosby [D] |
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #379 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #369 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 118 N: 48 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #340 - Recede From Senate Amendment (Y: 25 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #315 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 48 N: 121 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #271 - Passage As Amended (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #212 - Passage (Y: 104 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #369 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 118 N: 48 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #340 - Recede From Senate Amendment (Y: 25 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - House Vote #315 - Agree Sen Am (Y: 48 N: 121 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #271 - Passage As Amended (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Vote #212 - Passage (Y: 104 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 70 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-14 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-14 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-14 | House Insists | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Insists | |
2011-04-12 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-22 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-17 | House First Readers |