GA HB268 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the O.C.G.A., relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide for the time period for certification of election officials; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; time period for certification of election officials; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #313 (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #323 (Y: 102 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #200 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #97 (Y: 111 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #323 (Y: 102 N: 48 NV: 8 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #200 (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #97 (Y: 111 N: 57 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 250 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Postponed |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |