GA HB267 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to income taxes, so as to authorize private causes of action for equitable relief regarding the failure of employers to comply with revenue provisions regarding employees; to provide for attorneys' fees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; failure of employers to comply with revenue provisions regarding employees; authorize private causes of action for equitable relief

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-29HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2023-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-22HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2023-02-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback