GA HB264 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-11-2, Title 19, and Chapter 10 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to definitions for the Juvenile Code, domestic relations, and vital records, respectively, so as to repeal voluntary acknowledgments of legitimation; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Code; voluntary acknowledgements of legitimation; repeal
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-10 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House Hopper |