GA HB251 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sale or distribution to, or possession by, minors of cigarettes and tobacco related objects, so as to provide definitions; to prohibit the sale of alternative nicotine products or components thereof to minors; to provide for verification of age prior to sale; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tobacco; sale of alternative nicotine products or components to minors; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #712 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #560 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #560 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 491 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Hopper |