GA HB247 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding state sales and use tax, so as to exempt machinery used to mix or transport concrete from such tax; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; machinery used to mix or transport concrete; exempt
Sponsors
Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #266 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #85 (Y: 158 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Vote #85 (Y: 158 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 220 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |