GA HB242 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 10 of Chapter 21 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Driver's Education Commission, so as to provide for an additional penalty for violation of traffic laws or ordinances under "Joshua's Law"; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Driver's Education Commission; violation of traffic laws or ordinances under Joshua's Law; provide additional penalty
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #236 (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #50 (Y: 161 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #50 (Y: 161 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 332 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House Hopper |