GA HB237 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 and Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education and to revenue and taxation, respectively, so as to authorize the Public Education Innovation Fund Foundation to receive private donations to be used for grants to public schools; to provide for grant criteria; to provide for an income tax credit for qualified education donations; to provide for conditions and limitations; to provide for powers, duties, and authority of the state revenue commissioner with respect to such donations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Education Innovation Fund Foundation; receive private donations for grants to public schools; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] |
Rep. Randy Nix [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #366 (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #425 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Vote #109 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #425 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Vote #109 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-27 | Act 32 | |
2017-04-27 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |