GA HB237 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 49-5-8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the powers and duties of the Department of Human Resources with respect to programs and protection for children, so as to revise a provision relating to financial assistance for adoptive parents; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Human Resources, Department of; financial assistance for adoptive parents; revise provision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #257 - Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-18 - House - House Vote #55 - Pass (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2009-02-18 - House - House Vote #55 - Pass (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-21 | Act 34 | |
2009-04-21 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | House Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-19 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-18 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-18 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-03 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-02 | House First Readers |