GA HB23 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 36 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to annexation of territory, so as to allow affected local schools systems to participate in the annexation dispute resolution process; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; allow affected local schools systems to participate in the annexation dispute resolution process
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Becky Evans [D] |
Rep. Zulma Lopez [D] | Rep. El-Mahdi Holly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-13 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-12 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-17 | House | House Prefiled |