GA HB23 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to specifically authorize electric membership corporations and their affiliates to provide broadband services; to provide for definitions; to authorize certain financing and partnerships for the provision of broadband services; to prohibit cross-subsidization between the provision of broadband services and an electric membership corporation's natural gas activities or electricity services activities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities and public transportation; electric membership corporations and their affiliates to provide broadband services; specifically authorize

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - House Vote #26 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateSenate Recommitted
2020-01-13SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-06HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-01-29HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-16HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback