GA HB228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 19 of the O.C.G.A., relating to marriage generally, so as to change the minimum age of marriage of a child from 16 to 17 years of age and to require any person who is 17 years of age to have been emancipated; to amend Chapter 9 of Title 19 of the O.C.G.A., relating to child custody proceedings, so as to correct a cross-reference; to amend Article 10 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to emancipation, so as to provide for requirements for filing a petition for emancipation for petitioners who desire to enter into a marriage; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage; change minimum age from 16 to 17 and require any person who is 17 to have been emancipated

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #366 (Y: 155 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #282 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Vote #77 (Y: 158 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-11HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback