GA HB225 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 36 and 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government and motor vehicles and traffic, respectively, so as to provide for definitions; to require all for-hire drivers to obtain a for-hire license endorsement before driving for hire; to require that all for-hire drivers have certain insurance; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; all for-hire drivers obtain a for-hire license endorsement before driving for hire; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] |
Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #382 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #363 (Y: 146 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #221 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #190 (Y: 160 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #363 (Y: 146 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #221 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Vote #190 (Y: 160 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 195 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House Hopper |