GA HB224 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to provide that credit for new purchases and acquisitions of qualified investment property shall be earnable for mining and mining facilities and allowed against a taxpayer's payroll withholding; to provide that certain previously claimed and unused tax credits earned by taxpayers may be applied against such taxpayers' payroll withholding under certain conditions; to provide for conditions and limitations; to provide for applications and proration; to revise definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and application; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; credit for new purchases and acquisitions of qualified investment property shall be earnable for mining and mining facilities and allowed against a taxpayer's payroll withholding; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #359 (Y: 158 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #432 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #322 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #124 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #432 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #322 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #124 (Y: 160 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 228 | |
2019-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |