GA HB217 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 47-20-83 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to certificated or uncertificated forms of investments and real estate investments, so as to authorize public retirement systems to invest in mutual funds, commingled funds, collective investment funds, common trusts, and group trusts; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Investments; public retirement systems to invest in mutual funds, commingled funds, collective investment funds, common trusts, and group trusts; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] |
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. David Clark [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #342 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Vote #66 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Vote #66 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 126 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House Hopper |