GA HB214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-34-26.1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to vaccine protocol agreements, so as to remove the geographic limitation on pharmacists; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Vaccine protocol agreements; geographic limitation on pharmacists; remove
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |