GA HB213 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to agriculture, so as to enact the "Georgia Hemp Farming Act"; to provide for unlawfulness of certain acts; to authorize certain academic research of hemp; to provide for licensing and permit requirements for hemp growers and hemp processors, respectively; to provide for the Department of Agriculture to enter into agreements regarding such testing and other matters;to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to schedules, offenses, and penalties regarding regulation of controlled substances, so as to revise the definition of the term "marijuana"; to provide an exception to the scheduling of tetrahydrocannabinol and tetrahydrocannabinolic acid as controlled substances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Hemp Farming Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #380 (Y: 51 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #345 (Y: 151 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #263 (Y: 22 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #264 (Y: 21 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #265 (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Vote #83 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Effective Date
2019-05-10 Act 314
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-11HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-08HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/213
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/180853.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/182164.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183046.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/185146.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187562.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16606
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17031
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17030
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17029
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17115
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17270

Bill Comments

feedback