GA HB212 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to barbers and cosmetologists, so as to allow individuals and facilities to provide blow-dry styling, braiding, threading, and the application of cosmetics without being licensed by the State Board of Cosmetology and Barbers; to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Niche-Beauty Services Opportunity Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. David Jenkins [R] | Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] |
Rep. Mike Cameron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2023-03-02 | House | House Tabled |
2023-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House Postponed |
2023-02-28 | House | House Postponed |
2023-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-02 | House | House Hopper |