GA HB212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 13 of Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to licensing of mortgage lenders and mortgage brokers, so as to exempt retailers, retail brokers of manufactured homes or mobile homes, and residential contractors from the requirement to obtain a license as a mortgage loan originator, mortgage broker, or mortgage lender under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Banking and finance; retail brokers of manufactured homes or mobile homes and residential contractors from the requirement to obtain a license as a mortgage loan originator, broker, or lender under certain circumstances; exempt
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #200 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #114 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #114 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-18 | Act 33 | |
2019-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House Hopper |