GA HB21 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-6-2 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the number of judges of superior courts, so as to provide for an additional judge of the superior courts of the Gwinnett Judicial Circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gwinnett Judicial Circuit; additional judge of the superior court; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House Vote #18 (Y: 157 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-01-17HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-16HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback