GA HB205 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 10-1-782 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to the "Georgia Lemon Law," so as to revise the definition of the term "consumer" for purposes of such law; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Lemon Law; consumer; define term
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Battles [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] |
Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - House Vote #131 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-01 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-09 | House First Readers |