GA HB201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 52 of the O.C.G.A., relating to waters of the state, ports, and watercraft; to authorize the Board of Natural Resources to promulgate rules and regulations regarding anchoring certain vessels within estuarine areas of the state; to authorize the Department of Natural Resources to establish anchorage areas; to amend Part 4 of Article 4 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to coastal marshlands, so as to conform certain provisions; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Natural Resources; promulgate rules and regulations regarding anchoring certain vessels within estuarine areas; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #342 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #120 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Vote #120 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 245 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-07 | House | House Hopper |