GA HB20 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to administrative procedure, so as to provide that policies or rules of the Department of Human Resources and the Georgia Trauma Care Network Commission regarding loans, grants, and benefits shall not be excluded from the requirements regarding rule making; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Human Resources, Department of; policies or rules; loans, grants and benefits; provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-02-10 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-15 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-14 | House First Readers | |
2008-11-20 | House Prefiled |