GA HB2 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding parks, historic areas, memorials, and recreation; to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to carrying and possession of firearms; to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to transportation passenger safety, so as to revise provisions of law regarding the carrying of firearms; to amend Title 27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to game and fish, so as to revise certain laws regarding the carrying of firearms; to amend Part 2 of Article 10 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to parking for persons with disabilities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Constitutional Carry Act of 2021; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] |
Rep. Heath Clark [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hopper |
2020-11-16 | House | House Prefiled |