GA HB199 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to change certain provisions regarding the income tax credit for interactive entertainment companies; to remove the sunset on such exemptions; to add an exemption for certain prereleased products; to provide for a new state income tax credit for qualified postproduction expenditures of postproduction companies; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax credit; interactive entertainment companies; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #319 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #303 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #214 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Vote #104 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #303 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #214 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Vote #104 (Y: 158 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-25 | Act 26 | |
2017-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hopper |