GA HB192 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 80 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding counties, municipal corporations, and other governmental entities, so as to provide that elected officials of counties, municipal corporations, school districts, and consolidated governments shall be reimbursed for expenses only through the submission of expense reimbursement requests; to prohibit an elected official of a county, municipal corporation, school district, or consolidated government from being issued or authorized to use a government purchasing card or government credit card; to provide for the promulgation of certain policies; to provide for access to certain records; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; counties, municipal corporations, school districts, and consolidated governments be reimbursed for expenses only through submission of expense reimbursement requests; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Tom Taylor [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #386 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #399 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #270 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Vote #112 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #399 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #270 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Vote #112 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 49 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-02 | House | House Postponed |
2015-02-26 | House | House Postponed |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House Hopper |