GA HB191 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to abolish the office of elected county surveyor of Ben Hill County; to provide for the appointment of a county surveyor by the governing authority of the county; to provide that the person currently serving as elected county surveyor shall serve out the remainder of his or her term; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ben Hill County; abolish office of elected county surveyor; provide appointment
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #67 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Vote #39 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Vote #39 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 66 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-31 | House | House Hopper |