GA HB19 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Effective Date 2023-05-05

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to make and provide appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2023, and ending June 30, 2024; to make and provide such appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2023 - June 30, 2024

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #387 (Y: 170 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #369 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #274 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #220 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-05 Effective Date 2023-05-05
2023-05-05 Act 351
2023-05-05HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2023-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2023-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2023-03-29HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2023-03-23SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 18th, 51st, 19th
2023-03-23HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 155th, 47th, 104th
2023-03-23HouseHouse Insisted
2023-03-23SenateSenate Insisted
2023-03-23HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2023-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-09HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2023-03-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-03-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-01-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-01-13HouseHouse First Readers
2023-01-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback