GA HB181 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - House Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to provide that mitragynine and hydroxymitragynine are Schedule I controlled substances; to repeal provisions relating to the regulation of kratom; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances; mitragynine and hydroxymitragynine are Schedule I; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-28 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #838 (Y: 164 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #765 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #200 (Y: 171 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2024-03-28HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2024-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2024-02-08SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2024-01-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2023-03-27SenateSenate Tabled
2023-03-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2023-03-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-02HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-02HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-01HouseHouse First Readers
2023-01-31HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback