GA HB170 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend various provisions of the O.C.G.A., so as to provide for additional revenue necessary for funding transportation purposes in this state; to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic; to amend Chapter 12 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Governor, so as to limit the Governor's power to suspend the collection of certain motor fuel taxes and require ratification by the General Assembly; to amend Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to revenue and taxation; to amend Part 3 of Article 2 of Chapter 10 of Title 32 of the O.C.G.A., the "Georgia Transportation Infrastructure Bank Act," so as to provide new criteria for determination of eligible projects by the Transportation Infrastructure Bank; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Transportation Funding Act of 2015; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #380 (Y: 129 N: 41 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #170 (Y: 48 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #171 (Y: 17 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #172 (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #173 (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #174 (Y: 17 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #175 (Y: 29 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #130 (Y: 77 N: 94 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 (Y: 84 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 56 N: 111 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #133 (Y: 123 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 (Y: 42 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #170 (Y: 48 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #171 (Y: 17 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #172 (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #173 (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #174 (Y: 17 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #175 (Y: 29 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #130 (Y: 77 N: 94 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #131 (Y: 84 N: 87 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #132 (Y: 56 N: 111 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - House - House Vote #133 (Y: 123 N: 46 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-04 | Act 46 | |
2015-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | House Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 19th, 48th |
2015-03-25 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 155th, 24th, 135th |
2015-03-25 | House | House Insisted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Insisted |
2015-03-24 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-24 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-29 | House | House Hopper |