GA HB168 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 42-5-36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to confidentiality of information supplied by inmates, penalties for breach, classified nature of department investigation reports, confidentiality of certain identifying information, and custodians of records, so as to provide that certain information within inmate files of the Department of Corrections shall not be classified as confidential state secrets when requested by the district attorney for purposes of responding to proposed actions of the State Board of Pardons and Paroles; to provide for a definition; to provide for an exception; to provide for nondisclosure; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penal institutions; certain information within inmate files of the Department of Corrections shall not be classified as confidential state secrets when requested by the district attorney; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #256 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #62 (Y: 99 N: 66 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-04-21 Act 22
2021-04-21HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-23SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-02-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback