GA HB165 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2023-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-18-72 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to when public disclosure not required relative to inspection of public records, so as to include certain documents from the Department of Natural Resources; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; public disclosure not required relative to inspection of public records; include certain documents from Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly New [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] |
Rep. Leesa Hagan [R] | Rep. Bethany Ballard [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #216 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #75 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #75 (Y: 169 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective Date 2023-05-02 | |
2023-05-02 | Act 240 | |
2023-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House Hopper |