GA HB162 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Morgan County and to provide for its powers and duties, approved March 29, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3606), so as to revise provisions for the appointment, terms, and filling of vacancies of board members; to provide for term limits and removal of board members; to revise duties of the board and elections supervisor regarding clerical assistance and poll works; to remove expired and outdated provisions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Morgan County; board of elections; revise provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #42 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #22 (Y: 123 N: 41 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - Remove From Local Calendar: House Vote #21 (Y: 69 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-03 Act 47
2021-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-02-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-02-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-02-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-08HouseHouse Postponed
2021-02-08HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-29HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback