GA HB16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to discipline of students in elementary and secondary education, so as to revise provisions relating to bullying; to prohibit bullying and harassment of students and school employees; to require annual reporting of bullying and harassment incidents; to provide for definitions; to provide for requirements for local boards of education and state charter schools; to provide for requirements for the Department of Education; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elementary and secondary education; bullying; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Keisha Waites [D] | Rep. Dexter Sharper [D] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
2016-12-05 | House | House Prefiled |