GA HB159 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to amend, consolidate and supersede the several Acts of the General Assembly of the State of Georgia pertaining to the City of Molena in the County of Pike (Ga. L. 1982, p. 4935), as amended, so as to provide for four-year terms of office for the mayor and councilmembers; to provide initial terms of office for the mayor and councilmembers elected in 2019 and 2020; to provide for related matters; to provide for the continuation of terms of office in effect at the time of adoption; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Molena, City of; provide for four-year terms of office for mayor and councilmembers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House Vote #29 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback