GA HB158 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to change the date of the nonpartisan election; to provide for qualifying dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections; nonpartisan election; change date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #338 - Agree Sen Sub (Y: 143 N: 19 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Vote #133 - Passage (Y: 126 N: 23 NV: 23 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #318 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Vote #133 - Passage (Y: 126 N: 23 NV: 23 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-13 | Act 239 | |
2011-05-13 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Engrossed | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-04 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-07 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-03 | House First Readers |